Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Church
CC40191
9429052334245
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

145 Moire Road
West Harbour
Auckland
0618

Charity's other details

09 416 8991
https://www.facebook.com/profile.php?id=100089267582251&sk=about


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Agape Alliance Christian Church
Blockhouse Bay Community Church
Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
Chinese Alliance Christian Church
Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To be a worship center for the congregation that meet each week, and a place where the community come together for friendship and activities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Social services, Employment, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

We do not trade in the sense that we neither buy or sell anything on the property . Rental is received from the Chinese Church, Korean church, SDA and the Kindergarten to cover utilities used.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 31/03/2025 7/04/2025 $96,852 $102,515 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2023 29/02/2024 30/01/2024 $60,839 $31,273 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2022 31/01/2023 30/11/2022 $57,426 $64,681 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2021 28/02/2022 19/02/2022 $57,426 $64,681 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2020 31/01/2021 24/01/2021 $62,594 $67,554 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2019 31/01/2020 30/01/2020 $69,123 $63,990 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2019 $105,752 $50,009 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2017 31/01/2018 29/01/2018 $58,328 $53,615 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2016 31/01/2017 2/01/2017 $52,570 $60,967 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2015 31/01/2016 1/03/2016 $59,760 $62,941 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover the 17 month period from 1 August 2023 to 31 December 2024.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Daniel Schwamm Pastor 26/11/2024
MARINO JARA COCAMAS JR committee member 6/10/2019
Philip John Ruston Elder 6/10/2019
Tom McKean Elder/Treasurer 24/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew o Marshall Oversite Director 26/11/2024
Gail Marilyn Ormsby Secretary 26/11/2024
Joanne Thomas Youth Leader 30/11/2022
Gordon Miller Pastor 1/07/2022
Robert Frederick Martin Beaver eLDER 1/01/2022
John Antony Moore Committee Member 30/11/2020
Barry Thomas Elder 14/11/2020
Iakopo (jacob) Lauaki Elder 1/10/2019
Bethany Lauaki Secretary 1/04/2019
Kevin Thom Committee Member 1/04/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/12/2024 NOC027
31/01/2024 NOC026
3/05/2023 NOC021
3/02/2019 NOC014
30/01/2018 NOC012
30/01/2018 NOC011
29/11/2016 NOC008
18/12/2013 NOC007
17/12/2012 AR005
17/10/2011 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.