Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church
CC40192
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
July 31

Address for service

145 Moire Road
West Harbour
Auckland
0618

Charity's other details

021 1885831


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Agape Alliance Christian Church
Blockhouse Bay Community Church
Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
Chinese Alliance Christian Church
Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Religious activities, provide communication skill including language class for Chinese new immigrants. Information and counselling to families and overseas students of Chinese Ethnic group.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

We affliliate to the Blockhouse Bay Christian Church of Chrisitan and Missionary Alliance as our parent church. We have a committe of 5 memebers, the chair person who usually is a pastor, one treasurer, one secretary, 2 usual committee members. We have 19 in our congregation as active members who have right to vote in AGM. Non members are constantly welcome to join our activities.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2024 31/01/2025 17/09/2024 $45,514 $43,772 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2023 31/01/2024 14/11/2023 $39,909 $40,128 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2022 31/01/2023 14/10/2022 $35,286 $40,385 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2021 31/01/2022 17/10/2021 $36,970 $41,789 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2020 31/01/2021 8/08/2020 $42,414 $41,994 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2019 31/01/2020 22/08/2019 $45,972 $47,562 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2018 31/01/2019 7/11/2018 $40,892 $44,116 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2017 31/01/2018 28/11/2017 $37,671 $42,030 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2016 31/01/2017 28/12/2016 $35,997 $55,178 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2015 31/01/2016 4/01/2016 $33,729 $57,620 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mina Chin Mei Chan Treasurer 21/04/2013
Lap Shun Chan Committee member 1/01/2010
Tat Ming Wong Committee Member 1/08/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anita Ka Wai Lai Committee member 11/01/2016
Sing Ki Yung Committee member 21/04/2013
Sung Wai Ho Committee Member 21/04/2013
Yen Chee Yung - Chan Committee Member 31/12/2009
Zhi Wei Chen Committee Member 31/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/12/2016 NOC008
22/04/2013 NOC002
18/12/2012 NOC001
28/10/2010 AR004
14/01/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.