Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Agape Alliance Christian Church
AACC
CC61492
N/A
Registered

Registration details

9/08/2023
March 31

Address for service

14 Stellamaris Way
Northpark
Auckland
2013

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/agapechurchnz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Agape Alliance Christian Church
Blockhouse Bay Community Church
Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
Chinese Alliance Christian Church
Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The ultimate purpose of Agape Alliance Christian Church is to share God’s Love, glorify His name and to be diligent in preaching the Gospel of Jesus Christ; leading people to become believers, and nurturing them to be faithful disciples, and members of Agape Alliance Christian Church

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Legal Structure

Unincorporated Organisation

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/11/2024 21/09/2024 $98,996 $34,091 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sean Han Ping Shu Vice-Chairman 9/08/2023
Addy Wai Bun Wong Treasurer 21/05/2023
Jamie Ming Jia Zhang Chairman 21/05/2023
Warren Jian Feng Zou Vice Treasurer 21/05/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/03/2024 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.