Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
CC40186
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
July 31

Address for service

25 Rockfield Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/nzccma


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Agape Alliance Christian Church
Blockhouse Bay Community Church
Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
Chinese Alliance Christian Church
Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To glorify God, and evangelise the Gospel of Jesus Christ, especially to communities in the central suburbs of Auckland.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Unincorporated Organisation

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Aihua Christian & Missionary Alliance Church (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2024 31/01/2025 25/01/2025 $283,517 $227,352 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2023 31/01/2024 31/01/2024 $254,814 $246,328 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2022 31/01/2023 26/01/2023 $175,801 $158,234 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2022 $190,035 $147,825 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2020 31/01/2021 28/01/2021 $209,481 $186,030 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2019 31/01/2020 22/01/2020 $183,967 $152,867 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2018 31/01/2019 6/08/2019 $151,863 $183,870 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2017 31/01/2018 23/07/2019 $176,348 $174,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2016 31/01/2017 5/03/2019 $201,120 $186,091 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2015 31/01/2016 11/03/2016 $154,257 $160,961 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alex Leung Officer 1/01/2025
Angela Chou Officer 1/01/2025
Albert Law Chairman 1/01/2024
Bobo Leung Treasurer 1/01/2024
Dean Ding Vice Treasurer 1/01/2024
Hanling Yan Secretary 1/01/2024
Frank Wong Officer 30/01/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ada Leung Treasurer 31/12/2024
Naxin Wang Vice-Treasurer 31/12/2024
Danny Mak Officer 31/12/2022
Albert Law Chairman 1/08/2020
Frank Wong Officer 1/08/2020
Yat Ping Lai Officer 31/12/2019
Guangsheng Yang Vice Chairman 31/07/2019
Alex Leung officer 31/05/2019
Shu Kay Leung Vice Chairman 31/12/2018
Ian Ho Committee Member 1/06/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/01/2025 NOC027
27/01/2025 NOC026
22/09/2024 NOC024
5/01/2024 NOC022
16/01/2023 NOC020
25/08/2021 NOC018
25/08/2021 NOC017
15/03/2017 NOC011
25/01/2013 AR006
11/01/2013 NOC006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.