Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Blockhouse Bay Community Church
CC40185
9429050389223
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 48056
Blockhouse Bay
Auckland
644
76 Dundale Avenue
Blockhouse Bay
Auckland
600

Charity's other details

09 626 6284
https://www.facebook.com/blockhousebaycommunitychurch/
Instagram: instagram.com/blockhousebaycommunitychurch


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Agape Alliance Christian Church
Blockhouse Bay Community Church
Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
Chinese Alliance Christian Church
Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide religious services and activities consistent with our Christian values guided by the following statement: We're called to be a tangible expression of Jesus to the world, empowered by the Spirit to proclaim the Gospel, we aspire to be a diverse community of authentic people, characterised by genuine personal relationships with God and others, and we seek to be changed into fully devoted followers of Christ who make other fully devoted followers.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Pastors chosen by the congregation work with Elders, Management Teams and Ministry teams elected by the congregation to lead and coordinate the church's activities

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Blockhouse Bay Christian Kindergarten (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 26/06/2024 $1,226,550 $687,453 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/09/2023 11/09/2023 $639,993 $638,149 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 31/07/2022 12/07/2022 $572,740 $572,532 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 15/06/2021 $612,046 $572,323 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2020 $621,321 $575,734 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 25/06/2019 $641,041 $620,906 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 28/06/2018 $759,343 $738,255 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 31/07/2017 $677,887 $680,197 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 20/07/2016 $260,646 $274,949 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mario Varre Elder 15/03/2020
Nicholas Mark Booth Elder 5/06/2018
Scott Goss Kirkman Member 5/06/2018
Alistair McDonald Clark Elder 2/02/2008
Andrew Charles Marshall Senior Pastor 2/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Esther Vanaguntla Member 28/06/2020
Daniel Forest Associate Pastor 31/05/2019
Carolyn Officer Finance Team Leader 5/06/2018
David Nuualiitia Elder 5/06/2018
Mario Varre Elder 30/07/2017
Bruce Edmonds Elder 19/03/2017
Nicholas Mark Booth Elder 19/03/2017
Mario Varre Elder 20/03/2016
Andre Herbst Elder 1/12/2014
Frank Marshall Elder 16/03/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/07/2022 NOC025
21/08/2020 NOC022
6/12/2019 NOC020
25/06/2018 NOC017
6/03/2018 NOC016
13/06/2017 NOC014
13/06/2017 NOC013
13/06/2017 NOC012
20/07/2016 NOC010
23/06/2015 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.