Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
Alliance Churches of New Zealand
CC40190
9429042871316
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
July 31

Address for service

PO Box 48056
Blockhouse Bay
Auckland
644
64C Dundale Avenue
Blockhouse Bay
Auckland
600

Charity's other details

0800 692 262
https://www.facebook.com/Alliance-Churches-of-New-Zealand-602887573071314/

Oceania

Tonga

Asia

China, India, Japan, Laos, Thailand, Vietnam


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Agape Alliance Christian Church
Blockhouse Bay Community Church
Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
Chinese Alliance Christian Church
Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Building Healthy Churches in New Zealand and supporting the work of Alliance International Missions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services, Fund-raising

Religious groups

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2024 31/01/2025 1/02/2025 $210,002 $203,023 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2023 31/01/2024 21/12/2023 $212,296 $228,679 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2022 31/01/2023 21/12/2022 $213,015 $232,379 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2021 31/01/2022 26/01/2022 $208,718 $239,390 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2020 31/01/2021 28/01/2021 $214,387 $251,382 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2019 31/01/2020 22/01/2020 $175,869 $208,554 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2018 31/01/2019 30/01/2019 $173,439 $185,449 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2017 31/01/2018 20/06/2018 $138,368 $136,915 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2016 31/01/2017 3/03/2017 $142,473 $147,769 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2015 31/01/2016 29/11/2016 $137,147 $127,042 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tyler Sant National Leadership Team Member 28/09/2024
Yan Ting Leung National Leadership Team Member 28/09/2024
Phong Hoang Nguyen National Leadership Team Member 21/12/2023
Maria Bala Varre National Leadership Team Member 18/09/2021
Miriam Pei-en Chen Bua National Leadership Team Member 7/11/2020
Andrew Marshall Trustee 17/10/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Danny Hoi Ming Mak National Leadership Team Member 9/09/2023
Philip John Ruston National Leadership Team Member 9/09/2023
Donald Robert Gordon Miller NLT Member 30/10/2021
Wai Ming (Gary) Chan NLT Member 31/03/2021
David Nuualiitia International Missions Representative 7/11/2020
Lap Shun (Paul) Chan NLT Member 7/11/2020
Ron Frederick Maddox Treasurer 31/12/2019
KIm Fai Law National Leadership Team Member 12/10/2019
Grace Chan Nuualiitia NLT Member 30/09/2018
John Gummer LIcensing and Ordination Chairman 30/09/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/10/2024 NOC022
24/08/2021 NOC017
24/08/2021 NOC016
25/01/2014 NOC009
21/01/2013 AR005
13/05/2012 NOC005
12/12/2011 NOC004
15/08/2011 NOC003
6/01/2011 AR003
10/11/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.