Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Chinese Alliance Christian Church
CC40187
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
July 31

Address for service

60 Ben Lomond Crescent
Pakuranga Heights
Auckland
2010

Charity's other details

09 576 7070
09 576 7078


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Agape Alliance Christian Church
Blockhouse Bay Community Church
Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
Chinese Alliance Christian Church
Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Preamble The Bylaws of the Chinese Alliance Christian Church shall be in accordance with the Constitution For Churches incorporated in the most current edition of the General Constitution of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand. (Hereafter referred to as The Alliance) ARTICLE I THE NAME The Church shall be known as the Chinese Alliance Christian Church (hereafter referred to as The Church) of The Alliance. ARTICLE II PURPOSE The ultimate purpose of The Church is to glorify God, and to be diligent in preaching the Gospel of Jesus Christ, leading people to become disciples, and nurturing them to be faithful believers and members of The Church. ARTICLE III DOCTRINAL STATEMENT The Church accepts "Article III the Doctrinal Statement of the Alliance" as outlined in the General Constitution of The Alliance of New Zealand".

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public

Legal Structure

Unincorporated Organisation

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 January 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 January 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2024 31/01/2025 28/01/2025 $427,287 $446,112 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2023 31/01/2024 5/11/2023 $420,115 $420,312 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2022 31/01/2023 3/01/2023 $338,979 $306,809 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2021 31/01/2022 25/01/2022 $312,658 $325,489 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2021 $299,338 $344,877 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2019 31/01/2020 24/12/2019 $317,464 $347,363 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2018 31/01/2019 22/01/2019 $330,555 $319,201 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2017 30/04/2018 19/06/2018 $308,405 $250,775 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2016 31/01/2017 2/03/2017 $367,252 $344,691 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2015 31/01/2016 24/01/2016 $62,642 $18,878 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joanna Chow Treasurer 8/10/2023
Chow Ping Penelope Yeung Vice Treasurer 1/08/2022
Stephen Kwok Wai Tsang Vice Chairman 1/08/2022
Lambert Cheuk-Ho Lee Chairman Executive Committee 6/10/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Wing Hei Caleb Liu Treasurer 8/10/2024
Ben Oi Him Mak Secretary Executive Committee 31/07/2022
Kwok-Pan Chow Vice Treasurer 31/07/2022
Elim Chan Vice Treasurer 31/07/2021
Stephen Liu Vice Chairman Executive Committee 31/07/2021
Athy Leung Vice Treasurer 4/10/2020
Gary Wai Ming Chan Chairman Executive Committee 25/09/2020
Billy Chun Hon Ho Treasurer Executive Committee 6/10/2019
Addy Wai Bun Wong Vice Treasurer Executive Committee 8/10/2018
Cheryl Famularcano Secretary Executive Committee 8/10/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/01/2025 NOC022
23/01/2021 NOC017
9/12/2019 NOC015
16/10/2017 NOC010
3/03/2017 NOC008
4/01/2017 NOC007
11/01/2013 NOC004
10/01/2012 NOC003
30/01/2010 NOC002
25/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.