Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
CC51927
N/A
Registered

Registration details

9/06/2015
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 82076
Highland Park
Auckland
2143
158 Pakuranga Road
Pakuranga
Auckland
2010

Charity's other details

095765134


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The church believes it is called by God to work with others in making Jesus Christ known through: Teaching and nurturing people in Christian faith Loving service responding to human need Proclaiming the gospel Seeking to transform society Caring for God's creation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The church is one of 273 churches affiliated to the Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand (PCANZ). It is guided by the provisions of the PCANZ Book of Order, however the church is autonomous and governance is the responsibility of a church council, which is elected by members.
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 28/12/2020 $276,125 $150,338 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 9/12/2019 $2,081,123 $1,157,731 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 17/12/2018 $365,957 $186,220 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 26/12/2017 $573,463 $183,465 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 10/12/2016 $771,638 $283,572 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $437,312 $193,752 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angel Wen-Hui Swasbrook Elder and Session Clerk 1/07/2014
Che Lung Huang Elder 1/07/2014
Ching-Neng Hsiao Elder 1/07/2014
Ching-Yui Tsai Elder 1/07/2014
Hsien-Tsung Lin Elder 1/07/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Keh-Hua Lee Elder 31/10/2018

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.