Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
Presbyterian Church Assembly Office
CC33597
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 9049
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
Unit 5
94 Dixon Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 801 6000


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Supports provision of religious services

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Religious activities

General public

Other charities, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Unincorporated Organisation

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church CC51927
Greenlane Presbyterian Church CC51817
Hope Presbyterian Church CC51719
Kaeo Kerikeri Union Parish CC24809
Pukerau Waikaka Valley Presbyterian Church CC52707
St David's Community Church CC51882
St Marks Presbyterian Church Pinehill CC52126
ST. JOHN'S PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (Mt. Roskill) CC51975
Waipawa Co-Operating Parish CC29223

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing consolidated financial statements for 30 June 2016.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 5/10/2020 $5,409,016 $4,938,393 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 1/12/2019 $6,075,374 $5,328,561 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 10/10/2018 $5,582,579 $5,090,271 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 27/02/2018 $6,855,479 $6,672,094 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 14/10/2016 $6,792,391 $6,483,803 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 21/10/2015 $6,354,237 $6,275,987 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Grant Blair Holland Council Member 31/05/2024
Chu Hang Tang Council Member 29/09/2023
Colin Stanley Marshall Council Member 29/09/2023
Honey Hukarere Thrupp Council Member 29/09/2023
Robert Andrew Scott Council Member 29/09/2023
Rosanne Gay Luxford Moderator 29/09/2023
Roxzan Monique Gahegan Deputy Convenor 29/09/2023
Ryhan Ahandra Prasad Leadership Sub Committee Convenor 29/09/2023
Faanape Katerina Kathy Taumaoe Convenor 1/10/2021
Marion Elva Sanders Council Member 1/10/2021
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew John Harrex Board Member 29/09/2023
Charissa Anne DuRose Nicol Board Member 29/09/2023
Felix Kim Board Member 29/09/2023
Jaco Reyneke Convenor 29/09/2023
Leilua Timaloa Board Member 29/09/2023
Anne Edgar Deputy Convenor 1/10/2021
Richard McLean Convenor 1/10/2021
Tukua Tuwairua Board Member 16/04/2021
Darryl James Tempero Board Member 25/01/2021
Wayne Ogden Member of Council of Assembly 7/10/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/05/2024 NOC027
31/05/2024 NOC026
28/10/2021 NOC025
20/08/2021 NOC024
6/07/2021 NOC023
12/10/2020 NOC021
24/09/2020 NOC018
4/05/2020 NOC016
26/10/2018 NOC014
26/10/2018 NOC013
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.