Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
CC52007
942905012370
Registered

Registration details

26/06/2015
June 30

Address for service

151 Lake Road
Belmont
Auckland
0622

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Belmont Presbyterian Church was established and remains committed to the delivering of the Christian message and practical services through worship at the Church Building, Bible study at the leader’s residence and reaching out to people in need.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Community development

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Church is one of 273 churches affiliated to the Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand(PCANZ) It is guided by the provisions of the PCANZ Book of Order, however the church is autonomous and governance is the responsibility of ordained elders and an elected Board of Managers

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 19/12/2022 $87,004 $81,966 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 28/12/2021 $75,858 $84,221 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 23/12/2020 $85,933 $82,366 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $86,850 $81,780 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 28/10/2018 $78,594 $80,011 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 14/11/2017 $82,133 $83,341 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 21/12/2016 $86,026 $87,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 15/07/2016 $90,565 $88,922 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Daniel Pearson Elder 5/06/2016
David Anstiss elder 25/03/2015
David Mckeown elder 25/03/2015
Pamela Mckeown Elder 25/03/2015
Sheila Isaac Elder 1/01/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Owen Rogers Minister 30/04/2016

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.