Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Albany Presbyterian Church
CC51813
N/A
Registered

Registration details

25/05/2015
June 30

Address for service

539 Albany Highway
Albany
Auckland
0632

Charity's other details

021 585973


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide funds to selected New Zealand recipients for religious based activities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

Funds for this purpose received from donations from church members, or from funds from activities organised.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 17/11/2020 $158,126 $152,404 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 1/10/2019 $151,981 $156,867 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 10/12/2018 $141,077 $85,064 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 23/11/2017 $122,654 $97,275 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 16/11/2016 $124,329 $122,066 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 9/11/2015 $146,238 $109,987 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eric Raymond Lucas Treasurer 27/02/2023
Anne Marie Aalbers Session member 4/10/2020
Helen Mary Simons Session member 4/10/2020
Robyn Mary Bolton Session member 4/10/2020
Paul Dreyer Chairman, Board of Managers 30/08/2020
Joanne Moorcroft Session member 1/03/2018
Carrie Turner Session Member 9/04/2015
Maurice Ellett Session Member 9/04/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephen Howie Session Member 4/02/2024
David Tripp Parish Treasurer 2/01/2024
Caleb Hardie Pastor 20/01/2023
Stephen Davies Session Member 20/01/2023
Stephen Ellett Session Member 28/03/2021
Anna Johnstone Elder / Session Member 27/12/2020
Kerry Johnstone Session Clerk 27/12/2020
Carolyn Wilson Session Member 25/03/2018
Mark Wilson Session Member 25/03/2018
John Ronald Utting Treasurer 31/05/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/04/2023 NOC009
18/10/2021 NOC008
13/10/2021 NOC007
7/08/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.