Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Alpine Presbytery
CC51951
N/A
Registered

Registration details

13/05/2015
June 30

Address for service

2 MacMillan Avenue
Cashmere
Christchurch
8022

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster, resource, encourage and support churches and faith communities in the Canterbury, Nelson, Marlborough and West Coast regions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

Affiliated to the Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 21/09/2020 $4,460,952 $452,456 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 3/10/2019 $275,572 $636,139 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 1/11/2018 $4,078,115 $606,849 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 16/10/2017 $436,274 $343,594 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 5/12/2016 $244,879 $508,763 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 16/11/2015 $585,524 $440,064 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rory Mor McLeod Grant Member 28/05/2021
Jason Robert King Member 27/05/2021
Martin James Stewart Executive Officer 1/07/2020
Brent Thomas Richardson Member 27/07/2017
Jonathan David Parkes Council member 23/02/2017
Lynette Gail Heine Member 17/05/2014
Margaret Ann McMillan Convenor Property & Finance 17/05/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christine Alisen Arnold Treasurer 30/06/2023
Maureen Ann Bishop Member 16/09/2022
Andrew Nicol Member 23/12/2021
Barry Richard Ayers Moderator 4/10/2021
Dugald Wilson Member 29/04/2021
Phyllis Muriel Harris Human Resources Convenor 29/04/2021
Colin Price Member 20/02/2019
Anne Elizabeth Stewart Convenor Human Resources 27/04/2018
Denis Cheston Brown Member 27/04/2018
Elizabeth Catherine Whitehead Member 27/04/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/10/2023 NOC014
3/10/2022 NOC013
18/10/2021 NOC012
27/08/2020 NOC010
8/06/2018 NOC007
20/04/2017 NOC005
17/06/2016 NOC003
3/06/2016 NOC002
16/09/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.