Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
CC51874
N/A
Registered

Registration details

29/05/2015
June 30

Address for service

72-74 Clyde Street
Balclutha
9230

Charity's other details

03 4181883


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The church believes it is called by God to work with others in making Jesus Christ known through: Teaching & Nurturing people in Christian faith Loving service responding to human need Proclaiming the gospel Seeking to transform society caring for God's creation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

General public

Legal Structure

Unincorporated Organisation

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 15/12/2020 $112,803 $143,014 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 22/10/2019 $105,751 $136,389 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 5/11/2018 $97,267 $135,703 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 27/11/2017 $90,966 $106,095 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 8/11/2016 $101,476 $114,198 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 13/10/2015 $92,366 $97,185 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nathan White Council Member 12/02/2024
Shona (Joyce) Beck Council Member 15/10/2023
Marsha Anderson Council Member 15/02/2022
Hilary Rachel McKenzie White Session Clerk 26/09/2018
Brian Robert Dodds Council member 21/08/2018
Erin Lynda Pendreigh Minister 21/08/2018
Robert John Pendreigh Minister 21/08/2018
Annette Klaassen Elder 11/05/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Matthew Robert Simpson Council member 15/10/2023
Edith Ruth Johnstone Elder 18/04/2023
Esther Joy Sinclair Council Member 20/02/2021
Aleni Ioane Elder 1/12/2020
Samuel Senada Council Member 1/12/2020
Martin Maina Mbougua Council member 31/01/2020
Isabella Kell Session Clerk 16/10/2019
Margaret Christina Heaps Council member 31/12/2018
Alison Dodds Elder 21/08/2018
Edna Geddes Elder 21/08/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/08/2024 NOC011
11/12/2020 NOC008
17/10/2018 NOC005
8/12/2016 NOC003
27/07/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.