Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Napier North Presbyterian Church
CC52393
N/A
Registered

Registration details

24/09/2015
June 30

Address for service

246 Seafield Road
RD 2
Napier
4182

Charity's other details

06 8365463


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We believe God is calling us to be a vibrant, loving growing and outward looking church community. Our mission is to see a growing number of people become life-long followers of Jesus christ for the good of the world God loves.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Fund-raising

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The church is affiliated to the Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand (PCANZ). It is guided by the provisions of the PCANZ Book of Order. However, the church is autonomous and governance is the responsibility of the church councils: the Session and the Board of Managers, which are elected by members. The church entity incorporates the associated entity, Knox Opportunity Shop.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 12/11/2020 $156,402 $133,323 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $112,262 $129,859 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 27/11/2018 $103,125 $89,463 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 19/12/2017 $99,694 $102,439 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 23/01/2017 $110,188 $92,539 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Julia Forrest Secretary, Board of Managers 10/11/2020
Courtney Forrest Children/Community Worker 10/02/2020
Denise Kinge Treasurer Board of Managers 14/11/2019
Rodney Stan Herries Manager 25/08/2019
Timothy Jenkinson Chairman Managers 25/08/2019
Gaye Herries Elder 14/02/2019
Margaret Hall Session Clerk /Elder/Privacy Officer 14/02/2019
Janet Waddell Raitt Manager - Health & Safety Officer 26/08/2018
John Ashman Manager 12/12/2016
Joylene Whibley Manager 12/12/2016
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Murray Wiggins Manager 23/08/2020
Robert Bird Treasurer/Managers 14/11/2019
June Clark Convenor Op Shop 25/08/2019
Morna Fisher Secretary Managers 25/08/2019
Constance Mary Jessep Session Elder 26/08/2018
David Lees Dransfield Elder Session 5/06/2018
Kevin John Pettigrew Manager 6/12/2017
Margaret Greig Co Convenor Op Shop 30/12/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/11/2019 NOC006
14/11/2019 NOC005
15/06/2018 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.