Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


All Saints Church Mititai
CC41210
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

81 Simpkin Road
RD 2
Ruawai
0592

Charity's other details

09 4392154


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We are a small church committee running the financial affairs of All Saints Church at Mititai, near Dargaville and part of the Parish of Northern Wairoa. Our church is a Heritage Building and our aim is to keep it as part of the Districts history.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

General public

Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Raewyn Suzanne Robinson President 18/03/2008
Suzanne May Dreadon SecretaryTreasurer 18/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Valerie Lois Webb Secretary 31/03/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/08/2017 NOC007
16/08/2017 NOC006
16/06/2017 NOC005
23/02/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.