Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
CC49313
N/A
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2013
December 31

Address for service

116 Selwyn Avenue
Mission Bay
Auckland
1071

Charity's other details

09 5286212


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The 'St. Andrew's Kid's Club Trust', trading as 'St. Andrew's Kid's Club - Holiday, Before & After School Care' provides holiday and before and after school care for families with primary school in the local area. It provides safe and stimulating child care programs that center on Christian values.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Religious activities, Pre and after school care for primary school children

Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annabelle Serena Caroline Hale Trustee 12/06/2021
David John Wolfenden Trustee 1/05/2017
Stephen Lyndon Baxter Trustee 14/04/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Leith Margaret Hamilton Trustee 26/03/2018
Amanda Clare Jeffs Trustee 30/11/2015
Rowena Margaret Allabush Trustee 31/07/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/08/2021 NOC015
3/05/2018 NOC010
16/08/2017 NOC008
9/06/2017 NOC007
8/03/2017 NOC006
6/03/2017 NOC004
14/10/2014 NOC002
13/10/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.