Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Trinity Church Akaroa
CC51876
N/A
Registered

Registration details

2/06/2015
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 110
Akaroa
7542
39 Rue Lavaud
Akaroa 7520
Akaroa
7520

Charity's other details

033047012

Africa

Mozambique


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We aim to be an expression of Gods people and the combined Presbyterian/ Anglican church on Banks Peninsula, to witness to a loving , forgiving and living God by relating meaningfully to people of diverse backgrounds and belief, and providing a place for all to grow and belong

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Sport / recreation

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The church is one of 273 churches affiliated to the Presbyterian Church of New Zealand (PCANZ).It is guided by the PCANZ Book of Order, however each church is autonomous and governance is the responsibility of each parish council, which is elected by the members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 27/11/2020 $56,877 $42,791 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 6/08/2020 $68,060 $68,828 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 28/09/2018 $57,123 $33,552 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 20/12/2017 $94,996 $44,019 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 1/12/2016 $58,986 $37,367 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Clive William Weir Member 26/04/2015
Fiona Marion Paulin Member 26/04/2015
Ken Alexander Paulin Administrator 20/04/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chris Smith Member 5/08/2020
Gerald Carson Member 5/08/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/08/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.