Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
CC45580
9429036500444
Registered

Registration details

18/10/2010
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12135
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
15 Guildford Terrace
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0212707266


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide affordable quality housing for older people to rent.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides religious services / activities

Accommodation / housing

Health, Community development, Social services

Older people

People with disabilities, General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Borthwick Director 15/10/2024
Michelle McFadyen Director 27/08/2024
Elizabeth Lester Director 6/03/2023
Gerald Stephen Scanlan Director 9/09/2020
Judith Patricia Moroney Director 29/11/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kathryn van Wamel Director 7/04/2025
Lorraine Margaret McArthur Director 27/05/2022
Anthony Harkins Director 29/11/2019
Susan Jayne France Director 6/09/2019
Francis Horton Tuck Director 21/09/2015
Katrina Fabish Director 1/07/2015
Anne Pauline Campbell Director 10/03/2015
Reuben William O'Neill Director 10/03/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/04/2025 NOC023
7/10/2024 NOC022
26/09/2024 NOC020
14/04/2023 NOC015
15/09/2022 NOC014
9/05/2022 NOC012
23/09/2020 NOC010
23/09/2020 NOC009
7/10/2019 NOC007
21/09/2015 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.