Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
CC33771
9429042984016
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

P O Box 2103
Rotorua
3040
Corner Ranolf & Victoria Streets
Rotorua 3010
Glenholme
Rotorua
3010

Charity's other details

0275849997


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To financially support the Community Facing Ministries (“CFM”) of the Rotorua District Presbyterian Church (“RDPC”). CFM coordinates programmes to meet various community needs including food, socialisation, activity, sense of value and purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Obtaining grants from New Zealand providers to meet various community needs including food, socialisation, activity, sense of value and purpose.)

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Religious activities, Sport / recreation

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are a Trust formed by a Trust Deed dated 30 September 2002 together with Trustees Resolution dated 9 September 2019, and are answerable to the Rotorua District Presbyterian Church "RDPC". The Trust is kept informed of the financial needs of various Community Facing Ministry programmes and attempts to source funds to meet these needs, which are transferred to the RDPC.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by the 31st of December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by the 31st of December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 17/11/2020 $45,000 $45,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 14/11/2019 $27,904 $27,900 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 17/12/2018 $57,005 $57,051 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 23/12/2017 $52,515 $52,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 27/11/2016 $59,362 $59,350 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 17/11/2015 $38,595 $38,224 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Betty Miriam Lineker Miriam Lineker-Thompson Trustee 31/10/2022
Uria Annette James Jenkins Trustee 17/08/2022
Lucinda Jane Cheesman Trustee 8/03/2018
Anne Frances Paterson Trustee 19/11/2012
Christian Henry Pilaar Chairperson 7/11/2011
Anne Maree Ludgate Secretary / Treasurer 11/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kurien Koshy Yohannan Trustee 25/01/2022
Mark Hitchcock Treasurer 18/05/2020
Michael Coutts Trustee 18/07/2017
Arthur Vanner Trustee 17/09/2014
Connie Rae Lee Trustee 25/09/2013
Carolyn Frances Muir Trustee 19/11/2012
Christine Joy Hopper Trustee/ Trust Administratior 19/11/2012
Stephen Kenneth Bradley Trustee 19/11/2012
John Alemann Trustee 21/06/2012
Linda Ellen Woon Trustee 21/06/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/11/2022 NOC023
20/12/2021 NOC022
17/12/2021 NOC021
6/10/2020 NOC019
31/07/2019 NOC017
23/12/2017 NOC015
17/12/2017 NOC013
27/11/2016 NOC011
24/02/2015 NOC010
22/06/2014 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.